THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:48:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Huronia Medical Centre
240 Penetanguishene Rd
P O Box 790
Midland ON L4R 0E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 526 7956
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St Andrews Drive
Midland ON L4R 4P4
Phone: 705 526 1300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 60 Vancouver St
Yarmouth NS B5A 2P5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. RANDEEP DHILLON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Dhillon (CPSO#: 133899 )
Business Address: 103-240 Old Penetanguishene Rd
Midland ON L4R 0E8
705-526-7956

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Huronia Medical Centre
240 Penetanguishene Rd
P O Box 790
Midland ON L4R 0E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 526 7956
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St Andrews Drive
Midland ON L4R 4P4
Phone: 705 526 1300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 60 Vancouver St
Yarmouth NS B5A 2P5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. RANDEEP DHILLON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Dhillon (CPSO#: 133899 )
Business Address: 103-240 Old Penetanguishene Rd
Midland ON L4R 0E8
705-526-7956

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RANDEEP DHILLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHILLON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RANDEEP DHILLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHILLON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Jan 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jan 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jan 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 13 Oct 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Jan 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jan 2022