THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:23:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7055237100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 65 Larch St
Suite 402
MyHealth Centre
Sudbury ON P3E 1B8
Phone: 18339044599
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 23 Sep 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 May 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 12 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: West Nipissing General Hospital
LOCATION: Sturgeon Falls

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Kearney Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kearney (CPSO#: 133954 )
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Address: 65 Larch Street
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 1B8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7055237100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 65 Larch St
Suite 402
MyHealth Centre
Sudbury ON P3E 1B8
Phone: 18339044599
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 23 Sep 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 May 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 12 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: West Nipissing General Hospital
LOCATION: Sturgeon Falls

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Kearney Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kearney (CPSO#: 133954 )
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Address: 65 Larch Street
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 1B8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID MICHAEL KEARNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEARNEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID MICHAEL KEARNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEARNEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2022
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2022