THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:35:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: Ng, Sin Yee (Used Until: 01 Aug 2023)
Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: A5-9135 Keele St
Vaughan ON L4K 0J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 221-2180 Steeles Ave W
Concord ON L4K 2Z5
Phone: 4162920330
Fax: 4162920331
Address: 408-2855 Markham Rd
Scarborough ON M1X 0C3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 109-2101 Brimley Rd
Scarborough ON M1S 2B4
Phone: 4162920330
Fax: 4162920331

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 03 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sin yee Ng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ng (CPSO#: 134034 )

General Information

Former Name: Ng, Sin Yee (Used Until: 01 Aug 2023)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: A5-9135 Keele St
Vaughan ON L4K 0J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 221-2180 Steeles Ave W
Concord ON L4K 2Z5
Phone: 4162920330
Fax: 4162920331
Address: 408-2855 Markham Rd
Scarborough ON M1X 0C3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 109-2101 Brimley Rd
Scarborough ON M1S 2B4
Phone: 4162920330
Fax: 4162920331

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 03 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sin yee Ng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ng (CPSO#: 134034 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANITA SIN YEE NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANITA SIN YEE NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2022