THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:32:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Colombo Faculty of Medicine, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, SINHALA, SINHALESE, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5565 Wyandotte St E
Windsor ON N8S 4T9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5199972411
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1100 University Avenue West
Windsor Ontario N9A 5S7
Phone: (519) 997-2404
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 May 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 16 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. CHANNA GUNASEKERA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Gunasekera (CPSO#: 134091 )
Business Address: 5565 Wyandotte St E
Windsor ON N8S 4T9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, SINHALA, SINHALESE, TAMIL
Medical School: University of Colombo Faculty of Medicine, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5565 Wyandotte St E
Windsor ON N8S 4T9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5199972411
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1100 University Avenue West
Windsor Ontario N9A 5S7
Phone: (519) 997-2404
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 May 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 16 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. CHANNA GUNASEKERA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Gunasekera (CPSO#: 134091 )
Business Address: 5565 Wyandotte St E
Windsor ON N8S 4T9

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
24 May 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 24 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. CHANNA JANAKA GUNASEKERA may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. CHANNA JANAKA GUNASEKERA may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Colombo Faculty of Medicine, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 May 2023
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 May 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 May 2023