THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:20:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: ABDOU, MAHER GIRGIS NAWAR (Used Until: 03 Aug 2021)
Medical School: Tanta University, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 405 Martin Street
Milton Ontario L9T 2R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058765088
Fax: 18443004456

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR.MAHER .N. GIRGIS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Girgis (CPSO#: 134307 )
Business Address: 452 Southdown Rd
Mississauga ON L5J 2Y4

General Information

Former Name: ABDOU, MAHER GIRGIS NAWAR (Used Until: 03 Aug 2021)
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Tanta University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 405 Martin Street
Milton Ontario L9T 2R8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058765088
Fax: 18443004456

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR.MAHER .N. GIRGIS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Girgis (CPSO#: 134307 )
Business Address: 452 Southdown Rd
Mississauga ON L5J 2Y4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAHER GIRGIS NOWAR GIRGIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIRGIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAHER GIRGIS NOWAR GIRGIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIRGIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tanta University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2021