THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:16:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 140a Little Bay Road
Springdale Newfoundland and Labrador A0J 1T0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (709) 673-3911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 165 Main Street
Springdale Newfoundland and Labrador A0J 1T0
Phone: +1 877-578-4861
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DEEPAK SANGHA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sangha (CPSO#: 134419 )
Business Address: 140a Little Bay Road
Springdale Newfoundland and Labrador A0J 1T0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 140a Little Bay Road
Springdale Newfoundland and Labrador A0J 1T0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (709) 673-3911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 165 Main Street
Springdale Newfoundland and Labrador A0J 1T0
Phone: +1 877-578-4861
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DEEPAK SANGHA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sangha (CPSO#: 134419 )
Business Address: 140a Little Bay Road
Springdale Newfoundland and Labrador A0J 1T0

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEEPAK SANGHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANGHA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEEPAK SANGHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANGHA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 May 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 May 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Dec 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Sep 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 May 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 May 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Sep 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2021