THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:56:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: Adeyemi, Adenike Adetope (Used Until: 26 Oct 2021)
Medical School: Ladoke Akintola University of Technology (LAUTECH) College of Health Sciences, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 103-1221 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington ON L7S 0A2
Phone: 9053338222
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jan 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 18 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adenike Adebowale Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Adebowale (CPSO#: 135322 )
Business Address: 1221 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington ON L7S 0A1
Business Address: 310 Juliana Dr
Woodstock ON N4V 0A4

General Information

Former Name: Adeyemi, Adenike Adetope (Used Until: 26 Oct 2021)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA
Medical School: Ladoke Akintola University of Technology (LAUTECH) College of Health Sciences, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 103-1221 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington ON L7S 0A2
Phone: 9053338222
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jan 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 18 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adenike Adebowale Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Adebowale (CPSO#: 135322 )
Business Address: 1221 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington ON L7S 0A1
Business Address: 310 Juliana Dr
Woodstock ON N4V 0A4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADENIKE ADETOPE ADEBOWALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADEBOWALE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADENIKE ADETOPE ADEBOWALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADEBOWALE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ladoke Akintola University of Technology (LAUTECH) College of Health Sciences, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2022
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jan 2022