THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:07:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 The Queensway
Sunnyside Building West
Suite 223
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-530-6563
Fax: 647-670-2255

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 01 Dec 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 223-30 The Queensway
Sunnyside Building West
Toronto M6R1B5
Call: 416-530-6563
Fax: 647-670-2255
Date Received: 01 Dec 2024

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 The Queensway
Sunnyside Building West
Suite 223
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-530-6563
Fax: 647-670-2255

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 01 Dec 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 223-30 The Queensway
Sunnyside Building West
Toronto M6R1B5
Call: 416-530-6563
Fax: 647-670-2255
Date Received: 01 Dec 2024

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Dec 2024
30 Nov 2031
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 01 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Nov 30 2031
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. PATRICK JOHN CARROLL may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery, Division of Orthopedic Surgery, University of Toronto, in which Dr. CARROLL holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of their academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. CARROLL no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. CARROLL’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. CARROLL’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 December, 2024. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 30 November, 2031.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. PATRICK JOHN CARROLL may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery, Division of Orthopedic Surgery, University of Toronto, in which Dr. CARROLL holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of their academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. CARROLL no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. CARROLL’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. CARROLL’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 December, 2024. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 30 November, 2031.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Nov 2031

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2022