THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:43:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Iran University of Medical Sciences (IUMS) School of Medicine, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 602-500 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 17 Dec 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. NAZANIN NOORI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Noori (CPSO#: 135554 )
Business Address: 98 Hendon Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2M 1A2
6472943226

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Iran University of Medical Sciences (IUMS) School of Medicine, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 602-500 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 17 Dec 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. NAZANIN NOORI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Noori (CPSO#: 135554 )
Business Address: 98 Hendon Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2M 1A2
6472943226

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAZANIN NOORI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOORI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAZANIN NOORI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOORI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Iran University of Medical Sciences (IUMS) School of Medicine, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Aug 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022