Medical School:
Sidney Kimmel Medical College at Thomas Jefferson University, 2020
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases |
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
Western University |
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases |
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
Western University |
EL - Infectious Diseases |
01 Jul 2022 to 15 Jul 2022 |
University of Toronto |
EL - Infectious Diseases |
20 Jun 2022 to 30 Jun 2022 |
University of Toronto |
EL - Infectious Diseases |
20 Jun 2022 to 30 Jun 2022 |
University of Toronto |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
EL - Infectious Diseases
DATE:
01 Jul 2022 to 15 Jul 2022
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
EL - Infectious Diseases
DATE:
20 Jun 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
EL - Infectious Diseases
DATE:
20 Jun 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto