THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 04:47:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Icahn School of Medicine at Mount Sinai, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 150 55th St
Brooklyn NY United States 11220-2559
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pasternac Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Pasternac (CPSO#: 135682 )
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Emergency Department
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Icahn School of Medicine at Mount Sinai, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 150 55th St
Brooklyn NY United States 11220-2559
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pasternac Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Pasternac (CPSO#: 135682 )
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Emergency Department
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
25 May 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 25 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. KYLE PASTERNAC may practise medicine independently in emergency medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. KYLE PASTERNAC may practise medicine independently in emergency medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Icahn School of Medicine at Mount Sinai, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 May 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 May 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2022