THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:25:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 York St
Toronto ON M5H 3S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416) 350-5900
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Mar 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Geurts Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Geurts (CPSO#: 135721 )
Business Address: 100-150 York St
Toronto ON M5H 3S5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 150 York St
Toronto ON M5H 3S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416) 350-5900
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Mar 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Geurts Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Geurts (CPSO#: 135721 )
Business Address: 100-150 York St
Toronto ON M5H 3S5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK PETER GEURTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEURTS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK PETER GEURTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEURTS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2022
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Mar 2022