THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:51:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 46 General Hospital Dr
Stratford General Hospital
Stratford ON N5A 2Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 98 Shipley St
Clinton Public Hospital
Clinton ON N0M 1L0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 107-444 Douro St
Stratford Internal Medicine Associates
Stratford ON N5A 0E6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 07 Mar 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 07 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Abhishiek Setia Medicine Progessional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jul 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Setia (CPSO#: 135726 )
Business Address: 50 Pali Dr
Brampton ON L6P 2S6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 46 General Hospital Dr
Stratford General Hospital
Stratford ON N5A 2Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 98 Shipley St
Clinton Public Hospital
Clinton ON N0M 1L0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 107-444 Douro St
Stratford Internal Medicine Associates
Stratford ON N5A 0E6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 07 Mar 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 07 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Abhishiek Setia Medicine Progessional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jul 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Setia (CPSO#: 135726 )
Business Address: 50 Pali Dr
Brampton ON L6P 2S6

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
07 Mar 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 07 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ABHISHIEK SETIA may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and infectious diseases.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ABHISHIEK SETIA may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and infectious diseases.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Mar 2024
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 May 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Mar 2024

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 May 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2022