THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:24:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Dundee School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 40 Blowers Cres.
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052311829
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3838 Midland Ave
Scarborough ON M1V 5K5
Phone: 9052311829
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N SITHAMPARANATHAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sithamparanathan (CPSO#: 135864 )
Business Address: 202-300 Rossland Rd E
Ajax ON L1Z 0M1
Business Address: 103-3838 Midland Ave
Scarborough ON M1V 5K5
Business Address: 40 Blowers Cres.
Institute of Diabetes & Endocrinology
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0N4
905-231-1829

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Dundee School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 40 Blowers Cres.
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052311829
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3838 Midland Ave
Scarborough ON M1V 5K5
Phone: 9052311829
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N SITHAMPARANATHAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sithamparanathan (CPSO#: 135864 )
Business Address: 202-300 Rossland Rd E
Ajax ON L1Z 0M1
Business Address: 103-3838 Midland Ave
Scarborough ON M1V 5K5
Business Address: 40 Blowers Cres.
Institute of Diabetes & Endocrinology
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0N4
905-231-1829

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIRUTHIKA SITHAMPARANATHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SITHAMPARANATHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIRUTHIKA SITHAMPARANATHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SITHAMPARANATHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Dundee School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2024
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 18 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2023
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Dec 2024

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 27 Sep 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2023