THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:15:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University of London, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 15 Resolution Drive
Brampton Ontario L6W 0A7
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 2892985474
Fax: (289) 298-5472
Address: 55 Dusk Dr
Brampton ON L6Y 5Z6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 13893 Highway 7
Georgetown ON L7G 4S4
Phone: 9058734505
Fax: No Information Available
Address: unit 9-3100 Dixie Road
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 2A6
Phone: 905 273 7333
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Sep 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Toluwalope Makinde Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Feb 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Makinde (CPSO#: 135883 )
Business Address: 4-11755 Bramalea Rd
Brampton ON L6R 3S9
2898018999
Business Address: 15 Resolution Drive
Brampton Ontario L6W 0A7
(289) 298-5474

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University of London, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 15 Resolution Drive
Brampton Ontario L6W 0A7
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 2892985474
Fax: (289) 298-5472
Address: 55 Dusk Dr
Brampton ON L6Y 5Z6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 13893 Highway 7
Georgetown ON L7G 4S4
Phone: 9058734505
Fax: No Information Available
Address: unit 9-3100 Dixie Road
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 2A6
Phone: 905 273 7333
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Sep 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Toluwalope Makinde Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Feb 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Makinde (CPSO#: 135883 )
Business Address: 4-11755 Bramalea Rd
Brampton ON L6R 3S9
2898018999
Business Address: 15 Resolution Drive
Brampton Ontario L6W 0A7
(289) 298-5474

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
25 May 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 25 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. TOLUWALOPE AKINADE MAKINDE may practise medicine independently in Family Medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. TOLUWALOPE AKINADE MAKINDE may practise medicine independently in Family Medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University of London, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 May 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 May 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Sep 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Sep 2022