THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 04:56:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Western Hospital
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-2581
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: -
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 19 Jul 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 19 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tawnya Pancharovski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Pancharovski (CPSO#: 136201 )
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Business Address: 150 Sherway Dr
Etobicoke ON M9C 1A5
Business Address: 100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Business Address: 30 Bond St
St. Michael's Hospital
Psychiatry
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
(416) 360-4000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Western Hospital
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-2581
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: -
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 19 Jul 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 19 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tawnya Pancharovski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Pancharovski (CPSO#: 136201 )
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Business Address: 150 Sherway Dr
Etobicoke ON M9C 1A5
Business Address: 100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Business Address: 30 Bond St
St. Michael's Hospital
Psychiatry
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
(416) 360-4000

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
25 May 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 25 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. TAWNYA PANCHAROVSKI may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. TAWNYA PANCHAROVSKI may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 May 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 May 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2022