THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:50:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University College Cork School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 596 Davis Drive
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Jul 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 24 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: FILZA GUL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Gul (CPSO#: 136292 )
Business Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University College Cork School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 596 Davis Drive
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Jul 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 24 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: FILZA GUL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Gul (CPSO#: 136292 )
Business Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
08 Aug 2024
07 Aug 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 08 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Aug 07 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. FILZA GUL may practise internal medicine with Southlake Regional Health Centre, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. GUL’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. GUL’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. GUL’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 08 August, 2024, and will expire on or before 07 August, 2027, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. FILZA GUL may practise internal medicine with Southlake Regional Health Centre, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. GUL’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. GUL’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. GUL’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 08 August, 2024, and will expire on or before 07 August, 2027, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University College Cork School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Jul 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2021
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 07 Aug 2027

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Feb 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 2021