THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:42:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Birjand University of Medical Sciences and Health Services Medical School, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-87 Sheppard Ave W
Northgate Medical Center
1
North York ON M2N 1M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6474786800
Fax: 6477776147

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. JAVAN BAKHT MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Javan Bakht (CPSO#: 136558 )
Business Address: 2-87 Sheppard Ave W
North York ON M2N 1M4
Business Address: 1-87 Sheppard Ave W
North York ON M2N 1M4

Corporation Name: Dr.'s Javan Bakht, Masoudi, and Vahidtari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Jan 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Birjand University of Medical Sciences and Health Services Medical School, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-87 Sheppard Ave W
Northgate Medical Center
1
North York ON M2N 1M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6474786800
Fax: 6477776147

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. JAVAN BAKHT MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Javan Bakht (CPSO#: 136558 )
Business Address: 2-87 Sheppard Ave W
North York ON M2N 1M4
Business Address: 1-87 Sheppard Ave W
North York ON M2N 1M4

Corporation Name: Dr.'s Javan Bakht, Masoudi, and Vahidtari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Jan 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PARASTOO JAVAN BAKHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAVAN BAKHT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PARASTOO JAVAN BAKHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAVAN BAKHT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Birjand University of Medical Sciences and Health Services Medical School, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2021
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Nov 2021