THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:30:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 825 Coxwell Avenue
Michael Garron Hospital
H527
Toronto Ontario M4J 5C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164696580
Extension: 3804
Fax: No Information Available
Address: unit 16-585 Ontario Street South
St. George Medical Centre
Milton Ontario L9T 2N2
Phone: (905) 693-0044
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Credit Valley Hospital
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Area Hospital
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 04 Oct 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. K. BOCTOR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Boctor (CPSO#: 136605 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 825 Coxwell Avenue
Michael Garron Hospital
H527
Toronto Ontario M4J 5C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164696580
Extension: 3804
Fax: No Information Available
Address: unit 16-585 Ontario Street South
St. George Medical Centre
Milton Ontario L9T 2N2
Phone: (905) 693-0044
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Credit Valley Hospital
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Area Hospital
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 04 Oct 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. K. BOCTOR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Boctor (CPSO#: 136605 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KERSTINA HOSSNEY BOCTOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOCTOR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KERSTINA HOSSNEY BOCTOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOCTOR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2022
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2022