THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:55:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: Gbadegesin, Olukemi Rafiyat (Used Until: 12 Apr 2022)
Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-494 Christina St N
Sarnia Medical Group
Sarnia ON N7T 5W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 339-1070
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR OLUKEMI R OREMAKINDE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Oremakinde (CPSO#: 136628 )
Business Address: 2-494 Christina St N
Sarnia ON N7T 5W4
5193391070

General Information

Former Name: Gbadegesin, Olukemi Rafiyat (Used Until: 12 Apr 2022)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA
Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-494 Christina St N
Sarnia Medical Group
Sarnia ON N7T 5W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 339-1070
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR OLUKEMI R OREMAKINDE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Oremakinde (CPSO#: 136628 )
Business Address: 2-494 Christina St N
Sarnia ON N7T 5W4
5193391070

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLUKEMI RAFIYAT OREMAKINDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OREMAKINDE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLUKEMI RAFIYAT OREMAKINDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OREMAKINDE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2022
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2022