THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:53:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: AKHIGBE-ILLAMAI, INNINO FRANCES (Used Until: 05 Jan 2022)
Medical School: Obafemi Awolowo College of Health Sciences, Olabisi Onabanjo University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 County Court Boulevard
Unit C
Brampton Ontario L6W 4K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054600645
Fax: 905-460-0631

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Mar 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 17 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR I NWAFOR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Nwafor (CPSO#: 136852 )
Business Address: 200 County Court Boulevard
Unit C
Brampton Ontario L6W 4K7

General Information

Former Name: AKHIGBE-ILLAMAI, INNINO FRANCES (Used Until: 05 Jan 2022)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Obafemi Awolowo College of Health Sciences, Olabisi Onabanjo University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 County Court Boulevard
Unit C
Brampton Ontario L6W 4K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054600645
Fax: 905-460-0631

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Mar 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 17 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR I NWAFOR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Nwafor (CPSO#: 136852 )
Business Address: 200 County Court Boulevard
Unit C
Brampton Ontario L6W 4K7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. INNINO FRANCES NWAFOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NWAFOR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. INNINO FRANCES NWAFOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NWAFOR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Obafemi Awolowo College of Health Sciences, Olabisi Onabanjo University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2022
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Apr 2022