THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 06:05:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Nevis), 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 665 Earl Armstrong Road
Suite # 3
Ottawa Ontario K1V 2G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6138220411
Fax: 6138221399
Address: 135 Macbeath Ave
Moncton NB E1C 6Z8
Phone: 5068538983
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2401 Bank Street
Suite 1
Ottawa Ontario K1V 8R9
Phone: 6135206669
Fax: 18554902239

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jan 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 26 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Nevis), 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 665 Earl Armstrong Road
Suite # 3
Ottawa Ontario K1V 2G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6138220411
Fax: 6138221399
Address: 135 Macbeath Ave
Moncton NB E1C 6Z8
Phone: 5068538983
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2401 Bank Street
Suite 1
Ottawa Ontario K1V 8R9
Phone: 6135206669
Fax: 18554902239

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jan 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 26 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
25 May 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 25 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. LINDA WANGUI may practise medicine independently in Family Medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. LINDA WANGUI may practise medicine independently in Family Medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Nevis), 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 May 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 May 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2023