THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 03:31:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Edinburgh Medical School, College of Medicine and Veterinary Medicine, University of Edinburgh, 2021
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2401 Yonge Street
Suite 210
Toronto Ontario M4P 3H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-485-9044
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2398 Yonge Street
Vibrant Healthcare Alliance
Toronto Ontario M4P 2H4
Phone: (416) 486-8666
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. EVA LIOUTAS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Lioutas (CPSO#: 137072 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Edinburgh Medical School, College of Medicine and Veterinary Medicine, University of Edinburgh, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2401 Yonge Street
Suite 210
Toronto Ontario M4P 3H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-485-9044
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2398 Yonge Street
Vibrant Healthcare Alliance
Toronto Ontario M4P 2H4
Phone: (416) 486-8666
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. EVA LIOUTAS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Lioutas (CPSO#: 137072 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EVA NICOLE LIOUTAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIOUTAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EVA NICOLE LIOUTAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIOUTAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Edinburgh Medical School, College of Medicine and Veterinary Medicine, University of Edinburgh, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Aug 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Apr 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2022
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Mar 2022