THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:48:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Avalon University School of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1262 Don Mills Road
Toronto Ontario M3B 2W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-435-6857
Fax: (647) 689-2355

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 21 May 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 21 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. DHALIWAL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Dhaliwal (CPSO#: 137219 )
Business Address: 1261 Don Mills Road
Toronto Ontario M3B 2Z4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Avalon University School of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1262 Don Mills Road
Toronto Ontario M3B 2W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-435-6857
Fax: (647) 689-2355

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 21 May 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 21 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. DHALIWAL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Dhaliwal (CPSO#: 137219 )
Business Address: 1261 Don Mills Road
Toronto Ontario M3B 2Z4

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
22 May 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 22 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. KAMALPREET SINGH DHALIWAL may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. KAMALPREET SINGH DHALIWAL may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Avalon University School of Medicine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 May 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 May 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 May 2024