THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:30:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ahvaz Jondishapour University of Medical Sciences, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 77 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M2N 2H5
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 416-366-3116
Fax: 416-368-0708

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 77 Finch West, North York, Ontario M2N 2H5

Phone: 416-366-3116
Fax: 416-368-0708
Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 16 Dec 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Ghomeshi Medicine professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ghomeshi (CPSO#: 137301 )
Business Address: 77 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M2N 2H5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ahvaz Jondishapour University of Medical Sciences, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 77 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M2N 2H5
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 416-366-3116
Fax: 416-368-0708

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 77 Finch West, North York, Ontario M2N 2H5

Phone: 416-366-3116
Fax: 416-368-0708
Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 16 Dec 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Ghomeshi Medicine professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ghomeshi (CPSO#: 137301 )
Business Address: 77 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M2N 2H5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMIR GHOMESHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHOMESHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMIR GHOMESHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHOMESHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ahvaz Jondishapour University of Medical Sciences, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2022
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2022