THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:19:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad El Bosque, Escuela Medicina Colombiana, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Jul 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: GERMAN RAMOS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Ramos Rangel (CPSO#: 137321 )
Business Address: 125 Bronte Road
PH 2-12
Oakville Ontario L6L 0H1
9059235334

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Universidad El Bosque, Escuela Medicina Colombiana, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Jul 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: GERMAN RAMOS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Ramos Rangel (CPSO#: 137321 )
Business Address: 125 Bronte Road
PH 2-12
Oakville Ontario L6L 0H1
9059235334

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Jul 2024
30 Jun 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 01 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. GERMAN ENRIQUE RAMOS RANGEL may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Anesthesia, McMaster University, in which Dr. RAMOS RANGEL holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. RAMOS RANGEL no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. RAMOS RANGEL’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. RAMOS RANGEL’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 July, 2024, and expires on 30 June, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. RAMOS RANGEL's academic appointment at McMaster University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. GERMAN ENRIQUE RAMOS RANGEL may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Anesthesia, McMaster University, in which Dr. RAMOS RANGEL holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. RAMOS RANGEL no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. RAMOS RANGEL’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. RAMOS RANGEL’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 July, 2024, and expires on 30 June, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. RAMOS RANGEL's academic appointment at McMaster University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad El Bosque, Escuela Medicina Colombiana, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2027

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022