THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:52:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Midwestern University Arizona College of Osteopathic Medicine, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 106-222 Dixon Rd
Toronto ON M9P 3S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: C107-3885 Duke of York Blvd
Mississauga ON L5B 0E4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 8-478 Dundas St W
Oakville ON L6H 6Y3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 7333 E Thomas Rd
Agave Pediatrics
Scottsdale AZ United States 85251-7215
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Oct 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. BLUMENTHAL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Blumenthal (CPSO#: 137513 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Midwestern University Arizona College of Osteopathic Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 106-222 Dixon Rd
Toronto ON M9P 3S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: C107-3885 Duke of York Blvd
Mississauga ON L5B 0E4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 8-478 Dundas St W
Oakville ON L6H 6Y3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 7333 E Thomas Rd
Agave Pediatrics
Scottsdale AZ United States 85251-7215
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Oct 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. BLUMENTHAL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Blumenthal (CPSO#: 137513 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
25 May 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 25 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. RACHAEL BLUMENTHAL may practise medicine independently in Pediatrics.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. RACHAEL BLUMENTHAL may practise medicine independently in Pediatrics.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Midwestern University Arizona College of Osteopathic Medicine, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 May 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 May 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 May 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 May 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2022