THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:50:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Telemed MD
2200 Dundas St E
Mississauga ON L4X 2V3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1252 Lawrence Avenue East
Victoria Medical Group
#201
Toronto Ontario M3A 1C3
Phone: 4166091100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Aug 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MUFIDA WADHWANIA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wadhwania (CPSO#: 137671 )
Business Address: 2200 Dundas Street East
unit 5
Mississauga Ontario L4X 2V3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Telemed MD
2200 Dundas St E
Mississauga ON L4X 2V3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1252 Lawrence Avenue East
Victoria Medical Group
#201
Toronto Ontario M3A 1C3
Phone: 4166091100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Aug 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MUFIDA WADHWANIA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wadhwania (CPSO#: 137671 )
Business Address: 2200 Dundas Street East
unit 5
Mississauga Ontario L4X 2V3

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
25 May 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 25 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MUFIDA MURADALI WADHWANIA may practise medicine independently in Psychiatry
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MUFIDA MURADALI WADHWANIA may practise medicine independently in Psychiatry

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 May 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 May 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2022