THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:33:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Nevis), 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Wharton Medical Clinic
2951 Walker's Line
Burlington ON L7M 4Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2951 Walker's Line
Burlington ON L7M 4Y1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3075 Hospital Gate
Bone Research and Education Centre
Unit #223
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
Phone: 905-844-5677
Fax: 905-844-8966

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 May 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 05 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Oksana Symczyk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Symczyk (CPSO#: 137672 )
Business Address: 2951 Walker's Line
Burlington ON L7M 4Y1
1-833-962-5359

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Nevis), 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Wharton Medical Clinic
2951 Walker's Line
Burlington ON L7M 4Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2951 Walker's Line
Burlington ON L7M 4Y1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3075 Hospital Gate
Bone Research and Education Centre
Unit #223
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
Phone: 905-844-5677
Fax: 905-844-8966

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 May 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 05 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Oksana Symczyk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Symczyk (CPSO#: 137672 )
Business Address: 2951 Walker's Line
Burlington ON L7M 4Y1
1-833-962-5359

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OKSANA ALEKSANDRA SYMCZYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SYMCZYK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OKSANA ALEKSANDRA SYMCZYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SYMCZYK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Nevis), 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 01 Sep 2025