THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:33:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3045 Baseline Rd
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Ottawa ON K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 25 Oct 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jul 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 25 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 03 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. KATHARINE A. HUDSON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Hudson (CPSO#: 137732 )
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3045 Baseline Rd
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Ottawa ON K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 25 Oct 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jul 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 25 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 03 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. KATHARINE A. HUDSON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Hudson (CPSO#: 137732 )
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHARINE ANNE HUDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUDSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHARINE ANNE HUDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUDSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2022
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2022