Medical School:
Vardhman Mahavir Medical College & Safdarjung Hospital, 2014
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology |
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
Western University |
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology |
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
Western University |
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology |
24 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023 |
Western University |
PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology |
01 Jul 2022 to 23 Sep 2022 |
Western University |
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
DATE:
24 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology
DATE:
01 Jul 2022 to 23 Sep 2022
UNIVERSITY:
Western University