THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:02:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Humber College Blvd
Ontario Heart Center
Suite 207
Etobicoke ON M9V 5G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167411042
Fax: 18778724511
Address: 100 Humber College Blvd
Ontario Heart Center
Suite 207
Etobicoke ON M9V 5G4
Phone: 4167411042
Fax: 4167440187
Address: 101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON M9V 1R8
Phone: 4167473400
Extension: 32163
Fax: 4167473611

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Oak Valley Health Markham
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jacob R Alex Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Alex (CPSO#: 137909 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Humber College Blvd
Ontario Heart Center
Suite 207
Etobicoke ON M9V 5G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167411042
Fax: 18778724511
Address: 100 Humber College Blvd
Ontario Heart Center
Suite 207
Etobicoke ON M9V 5G4
Phone: 4167411042
Fax: 4167440187
Address: 101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON M9V 1R8
Phone: 4167473400
Extension: 32163
Fax: 4167473611

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Oak Valley Health Markham
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jacob R Alex Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Alex (CPSO#: 137909 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACOB ROMY ALEX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALEX is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACOB ROMY ALEX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALEX is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 May 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 May 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 2022