THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 03:56:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: People's Friendship University of Russia Faculty of Medicine, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MARATHI, RUSSIAN, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grand River Hospital
835 King St W
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 29 Aug 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 29 Aug 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 29 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 29 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Kothari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kothari (CPSO#: 138464 )
Business Address: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 4K9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MARATHI, RUSSIAN, URDU
Medical School: People's Friendship University of Russia Faculty of Medicine, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grand River Hospital
835 King St W
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 29 Aug 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 29 Aug 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 29 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 29 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Kothari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kothari (CPSO#: 138464 )
Business Address: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 4K9

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
25 May 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 25 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. JAY SUDHIR KOTHARI may practise medicine independently in psychiatry and child and adolescent psychiatry.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. JAY SUDHIR KOTHARI may practise medicine independently in psychiatry and child and adolescent psychiatry.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: People's Friendship University of Russia Faculty of Medicine, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 May 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 May 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2022