THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:51:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: American University of Integrative Sciences School of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Wellmedica Medical Centre
7600 Weston Rd
Woodbridge ON L4L 8B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 11 May 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 11 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elias Khorasani-Zadeh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Khorasani-Zadeh (CPSO#: 138566 )
Business Address: 55-7600 Weston Rd
Woodbridge ON L4L 8B7
(289) 371-3500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: American University of Integrative Sciences School of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Wellmedica Medical Centre
7600 Weston Rd
Woodbridge ON L4L 8B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 11 May 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 11 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elias Khorasani-Zadeh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Khorasani-Zadeh (CPSO#: 138566 )
Business Address: 55-7600 Weston Rd
Woodbridge ON L4L 8B7
(289) 371-3500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIAS KHORASANI-ZADEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHORASANI-ZADEH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIAS KHORASANI-ZADEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHORASANI-ZADEH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: American University of Integrative Sciences School of Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 19 Sep 2025