THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 04:37:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Benghazi Faculty of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health
Oshawa Hospital
1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Lakeridge Hospital
Ajax Pickering Hospital
580 Harwood Ave S
Ajax ON L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 580 Harwood Ave S
Ajax ON L1S 2J4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 10 Nov 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. BOBAKER MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bobaker (CPSO#: 138594 )
Business Address: 80 Bond Street East
Unit 601
Oshawa Ontario L1G 0E6
514-519-4347
Business Address: 28 Klein Way
Whitby Ontario L1R 0J8
5145194347

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Benghazi Faculty of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health
Oshawa Hospital
1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Lakeridge Hospital
Ajax Pickering Hospital
580 Harwood Ave S
Ajax ON L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 580 Harwood Ave S
Ajax ON L1S 2J4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 10 Nov 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. BOBAKER MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bobaker (CPSO#: 138594 )
Business Address: 80 Bond Street East
Unit 601
Oshawa Ontario L1G 0E6
514-519-4347
Business Address: 28 Klein Way
Whitby Ontario L1R 0J8
5145194347

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
10 Nov 2023
09 Nov 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 10 2023
EXPIRY DATE: Nov 09 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. SALEM A SULIMAN BOBAKER may practise Anesthesiology at the following locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

(i) Lakeridge Health - Oshawa Hospital in Oshawa, Ontario; and

(ii) Lakeridge Health - Ajax Pickering Hospital in Ajax, Ontario.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. BOBAKER’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. BOBAKER’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. BOBAKER’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 10 November, 2023, and will expire on or before 09 November, 2026, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. SALEM A SULIMAN BOBAKER may practise Anesthesiology at the following locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

(i) Lakeridge Health - Oshawa Hospital in Oshawa, Ontario; and

(ii) Lakeridge Health - Ajax Pickering Hospital in Ajax, Ontario.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. BOBAKER’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. BOBAKER’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. BOBAKER’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 10 November, 2023, and will expire on or before 09 November, 2026, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Benghazi Faculty of Medicine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 09 Nov 2026
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Sep 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 09 Nov 2026

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Nov 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Nov 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2022