THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 06:11:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4001 Leslie St
North York General Hospital
Emergency Department
North York ON M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167566000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 10 Oct 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 10 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin Wasko Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Wasko (CPSO#: 138755 )
Business Address: 373 Durie Street
Toronto Ontario M6S 3G5
3067414765
Business Address: 507 Glenlake Ave
Toronto ON M6P 1G9
Business Address: 199 Glen Cedar Rd
York ON M6C 3G9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4001 Leslie St
North York General Hospital
Emergency Department
North York ON M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167566000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 10 Oct 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 10 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin Wasko Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Wasko (CPSO#: 138755 )
Business Address: 373 Durie Street
Toronto Ontario M6S 3G5
3067414765
Business Address: 507 Glenlake Ave
Toronto ON M6P 1G9
Business Address: 199 Glen Cedar Rd
York ON M6C 3G9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN SHAY WASKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WASKO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN SHAY WASKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WASKO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 May 2022
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 May 2022