THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 06:08:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universität Zürich Medizinische Fakultät, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: University Health Network
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: University Health Network
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 01 Aug 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wettstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wettstein (CPSO#: 138794 )
Business Address:

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Universität Zürich Medizinische Fakultät, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: University Health Network
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: University Health Network
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 01 Aug 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wettstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wettstein (CPSO#: 138794 )
Business Address:

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Aug 2023
31 Jul 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 01 2023
EXPIRY DATE: Jul 31 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MARIAN SEVERIN WETTSTEIN may practise urology at the following locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

(i) University Health Network - Toronto General Hospital in Toronto, Ontario;

(ii) University Health Network - Princess Margaret Hospital in Toronto, Ontario;

(iii) University Health Network - Toronto Western Hospital in Toronto, Ontario;

(iv) Mount Sinai Hospital in Toronto, Ontario; and

(v) Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre in Toronto, Ontario.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. WETTSTEIN’s eligibility to take Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. WETTSTEIN’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. WETTSTEIN’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 August, 2023, and will expire on or before 31 July, 2026, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MARIAN SEVERIN WETTSTEIN may practise urology at the following locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

(i) University Health Network - Toronto General Hospital in Toronto, Ontario;

(ii) University Health Network - Princess Margaret Hospital in Toronto, Ontario;

(iii) University Health Network - Toronto Western Hospital in Toronto, Ontario;

(iv) Mount Sinai Hospital in Toronto, Ontario; and

(v) Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre in Toronto, Ontario.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. WETTSTEIN’s eligibility to take Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. WETTSTEIN’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. WETTSTEIN’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 August, 2023, and will expire on or before 31 July, 2026, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universität Zürich Medizinische Fakultät, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2023
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 31 Jul 2026