THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 03:46:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2021
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 75 Ann Street
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 2E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7052629672
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 28 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: PRISK MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Prisk (CPSO#: 138853 )
Business Address: 85 Line Hill Road
Huntsville Ontario P1H 2N5
7052629672

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 75 Ann Street
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 2E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7052629672
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 28 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: PRISK MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Prisk (CPSO#: 138853 )
Business Address: 85 Line Hill Road
Huntsville Ontario P1H 2N5
7052629672

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW CHARLES PRISK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRISK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW CHARLES PRISK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRISK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Mar 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2023