THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
28/05/25 02:06:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calabar College of Medical Sciences, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 189 Elm St
St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
South Building, Zone B
St Thomas ON N5R 5C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5192079100
Fax: 5192079200

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 31 May 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. TEYE UMANAH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Umanah (CPSO#: 138887 )
Business Address: 5192079100
Business Address: 189 Elm Street
South Building, Zone B
St. Thomas Ontario N5R 1J3
5192079100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calabar College of Medical Sciences, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 189 Elm St
St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
South Building, Zone B
St Thomas ON N5R 5C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5192079100
Fax: 5192079200

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 31 May 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. TEYE UMANAH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Umanah (CPSO#: 138887 )
Business Address: 5192079100
Business Address: 189 Elm Street
South Building, Zone B
St. Thomas Ontario N5R 1J3
5192079100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TEYE ANIEFIOK UMANAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UMANAH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TEYE ANIEFIOK UMANAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UMANAH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calabar College of Medical Sciences, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022