Medical School:
Universidad Militar Nueva Granada Facultad de Medicina, 2010
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology |
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology |
16 Jan 2024 to 30 Jun 2024 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology |
01 Jul 2023 to 15 Jan 2024 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology |
10 Apr 2023 to 30 Jun 2023 |
University of Toronto |
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology |
16 Jan 2023 to 09 Apr 2023 |
University of Toronto |
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE:
16 Jan 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 15 Jan 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE:
10 Apr 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
DATE:
16 Jan 2023 to 09 Apr 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto