THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:36:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: Oni, Abiola Jessica (Used Until: 01 Mar 2022)
Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1104 Fennell Ave E
CHAFFORD 100 MEDICAL CENTRE
Suite 1 & 2
Hamilton ON L8T 1R9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-674-4800
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 464 Welland Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2M 5V4
Phone: 2894381020
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 May 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ABIOLA J. SALAKO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Salako (CPSO#: 139203 )
Business Address: 1104 Fennell Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8T 1R9
2896744800

General Information

Former Name: Oni, Abiola Jessica (Used Until: 01 Mar 2022)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1104 Fennell Ave E
CHAFFORD 100 MEDICAL CENTRE
Suite 1 & 2
Hamilton ON L8T 1R9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-674-4800
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 464 Welland Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2M 5V4
Phone: 2894381020
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 May 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ABIOLA J. SALAKO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Salako (CPSO#: 139203 )
Business Address: 1104 Fennell Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8T 1R9
2896744800

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
05 Jun 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 05 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Abiola Jessica Salako may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Abiola Jessica Salako may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2023
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 2023