THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:45:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Edward Medical University, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1995 Lens Ave
Windsor Regional Hospital - Metropolitan Campus
Windsor ON N8W 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1330 Ouellette Ave
Windsor Regional Hospital - Ouellette Campus
Windsor ON N8X 1J8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Castle Road
Castle Hill Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia & Intensive Care Medicine
Cottingham East Riding of Yorkshire United Kingdom HU16 5JQ
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Dec 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: FAROOQ ASLAM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Feb 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Aslam (CPSO#: 139268 )
Business Address: 1995 Lens Ave
Windsor ON N8W 1L9
(519) 254-5577

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Edward Medical University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1995 Lens Ave
Windsor Regional Hospital - Metropolitan Campus
Windsor ON N8W 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1330 Ouellette Ave
Windsor Regional Hospital - Ouellette Campus
Windsor ON N8X 1J8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Castle Road
Castle Hill Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia & Intensive Care Medicine
Cottingham East Riding of Yorkshire United Kingdom HU16 5JQ
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Dec 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: FAROOQ ASLAM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Feb 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Aslam (CPSO#: 139268 )
Business Address: 1995 Lens Ave
Windsor ON N8W 1L9
(519) 254-5577

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Dec 2022
30 Nov 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 01 2022
EXPIRY DATE: Nov 30 2025
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MUHAMMAD FAROOQ ASLAM may practise anesthesiology with the following locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

(i) Windsor Regional Hospital - Metropolitan Campus in Windsor, Ontario; and

(ii) Windsor Regional Hospital - Ouellette Campus in Windsor, Ontario.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. ASLAM’s eligibility to take the College of Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. ASLAM’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. ASLAM’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 December, 2022, and will expire on or before 30 November, 2025, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MUHAMMAD FAROOQ ASLAM may practise anesthesiology with the following locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

(i) Windsor Regional Hospital - Metropolitan Campus in Windsor, Ontario; and

(ii) Windsor Regional Hospital - Ouellette Campus in Windsor, Ontario.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. ASLAM’s eligibility to take the College of Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. ASLAM’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. ASLAM’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 December, 2022, and will expire on or before 30 November, 2025, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Edward Medical University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2022
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Nov 2025