THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:53:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: Ahmadi Alghalandis, Kambiz (Used Until: 08 Mar 2022)
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 26 Holland St E
Bradford Health Care Centre
PO Box 535
Bradford ON L3Z 2B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-775-2025
Fax: 905-775-2026
Address: 99 Cornish Ave
Winnipeg MB R3C 1A2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Sep 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: KAMBIZ AHMADI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ahmadi (CPSO#: 139336 )
Business Address: 26 Holland St E
Bradford ON L3Z 1X2

General Information

Former Name: Ahmadi Alghalandis, Kambiz (Used Until: 08 Mar 2022)
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 26 Holland St E
Bradford Health Care Centre
PO Box 535
Bradford ON L3Z 2B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-775-2025
Fax: 905-775-2026
Address: 99 Cornish Ave
Winnipeg MB R3C 1A2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Sep 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: KAMBIZ AHMADI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ahmadi (CPSO#: 139336 )
Business Address: 26 Holland St E
Bradford ON L3Z 1X2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAMBIZ AHMADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMADI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAMBIZ AHMADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMADI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2022
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 2022