THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 04:00:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101-2 Dewside Dr
Brampton ON L6R 3Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Nov 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. SHALIMA MEHTA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mehta (CPSO#: 139350 )
Business Address: 101-2 Dewside Dr
Brampton ON L6R 3Y5
9057920074

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101-2 Dewside Dr
Brampton ON L6R 3Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Nov 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. SHALIMA MEHTA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mehta (CPSO#: 139350 )
Business Address: 101-2 Dewside Dr
Brampton ON L6R 3Y5
9057920074

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
25 May 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 25 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SHALIMA MEHTA may practise medicine independently in Family Medicine
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SHALIMA MEHTA may practise medicine independently in Family Medicine

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 May 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 May 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Nov 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Nov 2022