THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:38:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Rawalpindi Medical University, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300 Lillie St N
Thunder Bay ON P7C 4Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 35 Algoma St N
St Josephs Hospital
Thunder Bay Ontario P7A 4Z3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
Division of Dermatology
980 rue Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 03 May 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 03 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. HUMA JAFFAR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jul 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Jaffar (CPSO#: 139443 )
Business Address: 300 Lillie St N
Thunder Bay ON P7C 4Y7
807-698-8400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Rawalpindi Medical University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300 Lillie St N
Thunder Bay ON P7C 4Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 35 Algoma St N
St Josephs Hospital
Thunder Bay Ontario P7A 4Z3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
Division of Dermatology
980 rue Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 03 May 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 03 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. HUMA JAFFAR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jul 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Jaffar (CPSO#: 139443 )
Business Address: 300 Lillie St N
Thunder Bay ON P7C 4Y7
807-698-8400

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
03 May 2022
02 May 2029
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 03 2022
EXPIRY DATE: May 02 2029
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. HUMA JAFFAR may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Internal Medicine, Division of Clinical Sciences, Northern Ontario School of Medicine, in which Dr. JAFFAR holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. JAFFAR no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. JAFFAR’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. JAFFAR’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 03 May, 2022. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 02 May, 2029.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. HUMA JAFFAR may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Internal Medicine, Division of Clinical Sciences, Northern Ontario School of Medicine, in which Dr. JAFFAR holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. JAFFAR no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. JAFFAR’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. JAFFAR’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 03 May, 2022. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 02 May, 2029.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Rawalpindi Medical University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 May 2022
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 May 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 May 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 02 May 2029