THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 03:11:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Beirut Arab University Faculty of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 711 Concession St
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-2100
Fax: 365-317-8040

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: FADI AFRAM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Afram (CPSO#: 139504 )
Business Address: 711 Concession St
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
7808508510

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Beirut Arab University Faculty of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 711 Concession St
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-2100
Fax: 365-317-8040

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: FADI AFRAM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Afram (CPSO#: 139504 )
Business Address: 711 Concession St
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
7808508510

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FADI KAMAL SAEED AFRAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AFRAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FADI KAMAL SAEED AFRAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AFRAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Beirut Arab University Faculty of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Sep 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Mar 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2022