THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:34:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1145 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Z 7K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 03 Oct 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: AMANJOT SINGH SANDHU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sandhu (CPSO#: 139692 )
Business Address: 1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
6137226521 Extn: 6366

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1145 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Z 7K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 03 Oct 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: AMANJOT SINGH SANDHU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sandhu (CPSO#: 139692 )
Business Address: 1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
6137226521 Extn: 6366

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMANJOT SINGH SANDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDHU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMANJOT SINGH SANDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDHU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022