THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:58:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University College Cork School of Medicine, 2022
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 95 Hamilton Street North
Hamilton Ontario L0R 2H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056896134
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SHAUN NEEB PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Neeb (CPSO#: 140066 )
Business Address: 95 Hamilton Street North
Hamilton Ontario L0R 2H6
9056896134

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University College Cork School of Medicine, 2022

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 95 Hamilton Street North
Hamilton Ontario L0R 2H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056896134
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SHAUN NEEB PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Neeb (CPSO#: 140066 )
Business Address: 95 Hamilton Street North
Hamilton Ontario L0R 2H6
9056896134

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAUN ALAN NEEB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEEB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAUN ALAN NEEB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEEB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University College Cork School of Medicine, 2022

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022