THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 07:47:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sikkim Manipal Institute of Medical Sciences, Sikkim Manipal University, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5198225350
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 820 Main Street East
Milton Ontario L9T 0J4
Phone: 9058649898
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 810 Nipissing Road
Milton Ontario L9T 4Z9
Phone: 2894290350
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SURBHI SINGH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Singh (CPSO#: 140154 )
Business Address: 350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7L7
(519) 629-4615

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Sikkim Manipal Institute of Medical Sciences, Sikkim Manipal University, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5198225350
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 820 Main Street East
Milton Ontario L9T 0J4
Phone: 9058649898
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 810 Nipissing Road
Milton Ontario L9T 4Z9
Phone: 2894290350
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SURBHI SINGH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Singh (CPSO#: 140154 )
Business Address: 350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7L7
(519) 629-4615

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SURBHI SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SURBHI SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sikkim Manipal Institute of Medical Sciences, Sikkim Manipal University, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022