THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:05:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Nairobi School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 265 Dundas St E
Belleville General Hospital
Belleville ON K8N 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 28 Mar 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 28 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shaheed Sorathia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sorathia (CPSO#: 140180 )
Business Address: 265 Dundas St E
Belleville ON K8N 5A9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Nairobi School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 265 Dundas St E
Belleville General Hospital
Belleville ON K8N 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 28 Mar 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 28 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shaheed Sorathia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sorathia (CPSO#: 140180 )
Business Address: 265 Dundas St E
Belleville ON K8N 5A9

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
28 Mar 2023
27 Mar 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 28 2023
EXPIRY DATE: Mar 27 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. SHAHEED SALIM SORATHIA may practise internal medicine with Quinte Health Centre - Belleville General Hospital in Belleville, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. SORATHIA’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. SORATHIA’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. SORATHIA’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 28 March, 2023, and will expire on or before 27 March, 2026, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. SHAHEED SALIM SORATHIA may practise internal medicine with Quinte Health Centre - Belleville General Hospital in Belleville, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. SORATHIA’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. SORATHIA’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. SORATHIA’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 28 March, 2023, and will expire on or before 27 March, 2026, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Nairobi School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2023
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Mar 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Mar 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 27 Mar 2026